U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02204
  • Case Name: Labinski v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Reply Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Social Security - Commissioners Response Brief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • August 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • June 29, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.