U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02205
  • Case Name: Stennis v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 01, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 01, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.