U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01131
  • Case Name: Ortiz v. Acoustic Sounds, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 17, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • October 14, 2022: [ADR Report]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 18, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.