U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01130
  • Case Name: Mack v. Johnson Controls, Inc. et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 06, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Setting Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • October 05, 2022: [Electronic Filing Registration Form in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • October 05, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 22, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Electronic Filing Registration Form in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • June 15, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • June 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 03, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.