U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01132
  • Case Name: Hoffman v. Brenntag Southwest Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Minute Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • October 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • June 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.