U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04033
  • Case Name: Shree Kuber LLC v. Steadfast Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 03, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 03, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.