U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03109
  • Case Name: Watts v. (lnu) et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 22, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct Document]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2022: [Reconsideration]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct Document]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Show Cause - Prisoner Case]
  • July 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.