U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04038
  • Case Name: Mack v. J.M. Smucker Company, The et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • October 06, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 13, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 09, 2022: [Surreply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.