U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03108
  • Case Name: Hill (83060) v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 20, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Show Cause - Prisoner Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.