U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02207
  • Case Name: Wheaton v. Credit Control Services, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 10, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 06, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.