U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02208
  • Case Name: Siraj v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.