U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03113
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Kansas, State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • June 29, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.