U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03112
  • Case Name: Perry v. Crawford, County of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.