U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03111
  • Case Name: White (ID 76983) v. Schmidt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • July 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • July 06, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • June 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.