U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02209
  • Case Name: Schroeder v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs, The
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judicial Review from Agency - Plaintiffs Brief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • January 11, 2023: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Administrative Record]
  • December 06, 2022: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 07, 2022: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • November 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Intervene]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 26, 2022: [Administrative Record]
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • July 20, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 09, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.