U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02210
  • Case Name: Barnhart v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 15, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 14, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 08, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.