U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02214
  • Case Name: Ealy v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 11, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 17, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 16, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • June 09, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.