U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04034
  • Case Name: Clay v. Johnson, Jr. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [ADR Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 08, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • June 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 08, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.