U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02211
  • Case Name: Harris v. Kansas Employment Security Board of Review
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Adopting Report and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • June 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 10, 2022: [Consolidating Case]
  • June 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.