U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02215
  • Case Name: Sellers v. Genesh, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • January 03, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • December 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - Public]
  • October 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 08, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.