U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04035
  • Case Name: Russell v. United States Department of the Army
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 13, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • October 04, 2022: [Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 08, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.