U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02217
  • Case Name: Taliaferro v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2022: [Stay Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.