U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03115
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Pittsburg Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 23, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.