U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02218
  • Case Name: Central Bank of the Midwest v. Nueterra Capital, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 09, 2023: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 27, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 27, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • October 18, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 03, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • August 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2022: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 29, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • June 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.