U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03116
  • Case Name: Etier v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • January 03, 2023: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [More Definite Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 07, 2022: [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 10, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.