U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02219
  • Case Name: Confer v. Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • June 20, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.