U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01134
  • Case Name: Teetz v. Sedgwick County, Kansas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 23, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Deposition]
  • January 09, 2023: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 27, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 05, 2022: [Quash]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • November 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • November 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • August 26, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 26, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 12, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 13, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.