U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02235
  • Case Name: Brooks v. Wichita Airport Hotel, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 14, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 09, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 17, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 11, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Leave]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.