U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02234
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. Trans Union, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 22, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Reassigning Case - Minute]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 25, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.