U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02233
  • Case Name: Smoot v. Spring Hill, Kansas, City of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [ADR Report]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • October 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 03, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.