U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03123
  • Case Name: Kidd (ID 93399) v. Baker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Receipt from 10CCA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Record on Appeal Sent to 10CCA]
  • January 04, 2023: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • December 30, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • December 30, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • December 14, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Response]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Objection(s)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Conventionally Filed Exhibits]
  • October 24, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Martinez Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • October 18, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 14, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 14, 2022: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner Case]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.