U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02238
  • Case Name: Ingram v. United Biosource Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 20, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.