U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01137
  • Case Name: Miller v. Dollar General Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2023: [Conventionally Filed Exhibits]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 05, 2023: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • January 05, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 16, 2022: [Mediation Minute Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 06, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 26, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 25, 2022: [Statement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 11, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.