U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02236
  • Case Name: Lake v. USD 250 Pittsburg Community Schools
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • December 14, 2022: [Modify]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 09, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.