U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02239
  • Case Name: Newby v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • November 22, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • September 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Reassigning Case - Minute]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.