U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03124
  • Case Name: Strader (ID 66677) et al v. Cheeks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Request]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 21, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Recusal]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.