U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03126
  • Case Name: Salina, City of v. Gilbert
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Appeal]
  • November 18, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • November 18, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reconsideration]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Appeal]
  • September 12, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • September 12, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Appeal]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Response to Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • July 25, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • June 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.