U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03125
  • Case Name: Green v. Montgomery County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.