U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02241
  • Case Name: Pentair Flow Technologies, LLC, v. L.I. Development Kansas City, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2022: [Counterclaim]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 18, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.