U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02240
  • Case Name: Carrington v. Shark Bar, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 07, 2022: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • November 02, 2022: [ADR Report]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • September 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • August 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 20, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 05, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 21, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.