U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02242
  • Case Name: Wampler v. Wireco Worldwide Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • January 06, 2023: [Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Consent to Join]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • October 24, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Consent to Join]
  • August 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.