U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01138
  • Case Name: GEICO Choice Insurance Company v. Larin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
  • September 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 15, 2022: [Release of Funds]
  • August 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Permanent Injunction]
  • August 08, 2022: [Receipt for Interpleader Deposit]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Deposit Interpleader Funds (28 USC 1335)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Deposit Interpleader Funds (28 USC 1335)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • July 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 19, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • June 23, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.