U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02243
  • Case Name: Loucks v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2022: [Comparative Fault Designation]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 29, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.