U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02244
  • Case Name: Mack v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.