U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-40035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hicks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 31, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 16, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 16, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arrest]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.