U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02245
  • Case Name: Trevino v. Littrell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 18, 2022: [Mediation Minute Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • August 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • July 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.