U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02247
  • Case Name: Marble VOIP Partners LLC v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 19, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • September 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 30, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [AO Form 120 Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark]
  • June 24, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.