U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01139
  • Case Name: Corporate Lodging Consultants, Inc. v. Forman Industries, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Default Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • August 12, 2022: [Default Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • July 06, 2022: [Response]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.