U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02246
  • Case Name: Boliere v. Robert Brogden's Olathe Buick-GMC Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2023: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • January 06, 2023: [Setting Telephone Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 22, 2022: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2022: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 24, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • June 23, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • June 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • June 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.