U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04020
  • Case Name: LePage v. Salina, Kansas, City of, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Conventionally Filed Exhibits]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • December 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Leave to File Conventionally]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • August 10, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • July 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • July 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Return of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.